Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding LLC v. Frable, Rose
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Lackawanna County, PA. Judge Magisterial District Judge Sean P. McGraw presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2018
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2022
Filing Location
Lackawanna County, PA
Judge
Hon. Magisterial District Judge Sean P. McGraw
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-03 Applies to Rose Frable, Defendant |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-03 Applies to Rose Frable, Defendant |
|
January 18, 2019 | hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Sean P. McGraw |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-03 Applies to Rose Frable, Defendant |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-03 Applies to Rose Frable, Defendant |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Daniel Joseph Santucci, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by William Charles Cahill, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff |