Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Eric Martin Siebold vs Jamie Miller
On September 13, 2022 a post conviction relief case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Malheur County, OR. Judge J. Burdette Pratt presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2022
Last Refreshed
February 29, 2024
Filing Location
Malheur County, OR
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Trial - Court SRCI SID #16956456 Mountain Time VIA Webex Judge: Pratt, J Burdette |
||
February 27, 2024 |
Record - Proceedings CR1 11:41-11:43 Parties ready for trial as set |
||
February 27, 2024 |
Trial - Ready for Attnys VIA WEBEX Mountain Time Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
||
June 08, 2023 | Answer | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit | ||
May 11, 2023 | Petition - Amended | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit - List | ||
May 11, 2023 | Exhibit | ||
January 12, 2023 |
Order Amended Petition Now Due 05.11.23 Judge: Landis, Erin |
||
January 11, 2023 |
Motion - Time Extension Unopposed Mtn to Extend Time to File Amended Petition |
||
September 13, 2022 | Motion - Appoint Counsel | ||
September 13, 2022 |
Motion Proceed Indigent |
||
September 13, 2022 |
Order Scheduling & Setting Timelines; Amended Petition Due 1/11/23 Judge: Landis, Erin |
||
September 13, 2022 |
Affidavit of Indigence w/ 6 month inmate trust |
||
September 13, 2022 | Petition - Post Conviction Relief | ||
September 13, 2022 | Notice - Judgment Entry |