Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re the Matter of: ASHLEY ANAMIM CONTRERAS INIGUEZ APPLICANT
On November 24, 2021 a cv case was filed by Ashley Contreras, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 24, 2021
Last Refreshed
March 26, 2022
Filing Location
Yuma County, AZ
Filing Court House
Yuma County Superior
Category
CV
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: Denying |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: Birth Certificate |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION: Name Change |
|