Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CS-2015-00172
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Le Flore County, OK. Judge Jeffrey R. Singer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Le Flore County, OK
Judge
Case Documents
FILE RELEASE
Date: Dec 12, 2019FILE GARNISHMENT ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT/CALCULATION
Date: Jul 08, 2019ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE)
Date: Jun 06, 2019FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jun 06, 2019FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2016FILE GARNISHEES ANSWER
Date: Apr 19, 2016FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT (NO MAILING FEE ASSESSED)
Date: Apr 11, 2016ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS
Date: Apr 11, 2016FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: Feb 22, 2016FILE JOURNAL ENTRY
Date: Dec 09, 2015FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: Sep 28, 2015FILE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 24, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FILE RELEASE | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHMENT ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT/CALCULATION | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT (NO MAILING FEE ASSESSED) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/01/04 OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE JOURNAL ENTRY | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE PROOF OF SERVICE | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE SUMMONS | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE AND ENTER PETITION (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND |