Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LEWIS, KAILI L vs. LEWIS, KYLE
On December 30, 2008 a court of appeals case was filed by Lewis, Kaili L, against Lewis, Kyle, represented by Walters, Jennifer J., in the jurisdiction of Miami County. Judge No Judge Assigned presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2008
Last Refreshed
January 11, 2023
Filing Location
Miami County, OH
Judge
Hon. No Judge Assigned
Category
Notice Of Appeal To Court Of Appeals
Practice Area
Appeals
Matter Type
General Appeals
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CALLING ACTION Receipt: 24026 Date: 06/29/2009 | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | REFUND Payment to: HUFFMAN LANDIS & WEAKS | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | OPINION RENDERED - THE JUDGMENT OF THE TRIAL COURT IS AFFIRMED. | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL ENTRY - THE JUDGMENT OF THE TRIAL COURT IS AFFIRMED. Receipt: 24026 Date: 06/29/2009 | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | BRIEF OF APPELLEE JEREMY FARRIS FILED. | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ENTRY EXTENDING TIME FOR APPELLEE TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL MAY 5TH, 2009. Receipt: 24026 Date: 06/29/2009 | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED BY THE APPELLEE JEREMY FARRIS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF. | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | BRIEF OF APPELLANT FILED. (BRIEF OF APPELLEE DUE ON APRIL 15TH, 2009) | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | ENTRY - THIS APPEAL SHALL BE EXPEDITED FOR REVIEW AND DETERMINATION. Receipt: 24026 Date: 06/29/2009 | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF DOCKET AND JOURNAL ENTRIES FILED. | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ONE SEALED ENVELOPE OF IN CAMERA INTERVIEW BETWEEN LYNNITA K.C. WAGNER AND KAILI LORALYN KIHM-FARRIS. | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF TESTIMONY FILED. (ONE VOLUME - NO EXHIBITS) NOTE: BRIEF OF APPELLANT DUE ON MARCH 26TH, 2009. | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL DOCKET STATEMENT FILED | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT Receipt: 17524 Date: 12/30/2008 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPUTERIZED LEGAL RESEARCH Receipt: 17524 Date: 12/30/2008 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR TRANSCRIPT, DOCKET AND JOURNAL ENTRIES FILED | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | FEES FOR COMPUTERIZATION OF CLERK'S OFFICE Receipt: 17524 Date: 12/30/2008 |