Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAVELLE, MARK - vs - FULTON, ERIN AJH
On December 02, 2022 a civil - boardman case was filed by Lavelle, Mark, represented by Lavelle, Mark, against Fulton, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Judge
Hon. HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M
Category
SMALL CLAIM
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ISSUED | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INVOICE ISSUED | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO NEW ADDRESS: | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEBTORS EXAM FILED | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION ADOPTED /S/ JOSEPH M HOUSER | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ISSUED | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FEE PAID FOR ALIAS BY CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. ALIAS TO BE ISSUED | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS SENT TO ATTORNEY AND/OR PLAINTIFF/RA | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE SENT TO ATTY./PLTF. | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIM COMPLAINT FILED |