Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SEVEN SEVENTEEN CREDIT UNION INC - vs - CYLAR, KEVIN O AJH
On December 19, 2022 a civil - boardman case was filed by Seven Seventeen Credit Union Inc, represented by Datchuk, Esq, Joseph D, against Cylar, Kevin O, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Judge
Hon. HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M
Category
COMPLAINT FOR MONEY ONLY
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ISSUED | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FEE PAID FOR ALIAS BY CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. ALIAS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |