Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE NA - vs - LEAF, VICTORIA A AJLS
On December 12, 2022 a civil - sebring case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge SCHIAVONI (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Judge
Hon. SCHIAVONI (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH L
Category
COMPLAINT FOR MONEY ONLY
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT RETURNED FILED JL CASE NUMBER DOCKET AND PAGE: | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT: $ INTEREST FROM: INTEREST RATE: AND COS | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS SENT TO ATTORNEY AND/OR PLAINTIFF | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO NEW ADDRESS: | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE SENT TO ATTY | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |