Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LVNV FUNDING LLC - vs - WETZL, PATRICIA MKJ
On December 12, 2022 a civil - canfield case was filed by Lvnv Funding Llc, represented by Nennig, Gina M, against Wetzl, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Category
12/12/2022
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF GIVES NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF PL AINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIV. RULE 41(A) | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS SENT TO ATTORNEY AND/OR PLAINTIFF | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |