Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TARPLEY, MARIE -vs- ORLEIN, JEANPIERRE et al AMD
On December 21, 2022 civil - common pleas case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge D'APOLITO, ANTHONY M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 21, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Judge
Hon. D'APOLITO, ANTHONY M
Category
OTHER CIVIL
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II Ejectment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED
Date: May 12, 2023INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: Feb 17, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: Dec 21, 2022COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: Dec 21, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE ON | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ISSUED | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILER NUMBER P | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-TECHNOLOGY FUND | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK COMPUTERIZATION FEE (CIVIL) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-COURT MEDIATION PROGRAM | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT COMPUTER RESEARCH (CIVIL) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL AID (TOSCV) FILED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL NEWS | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED |