Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PNC BANK NATL ASSN -vs- WILLIAMS, COLETTE et al AMD
On December 02, 2022 civil - common pleas case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge D'APOLITO, ANTHONY M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Judge
Hon. D'APOLITO, ANTHONY M
Category
FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
JE SEE ATTACHED IMAGE
Date: Jul 12, 2023MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY
Date: Jul 10, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: Jul 03, 2023MOTION
Date: Jun 21, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT (FORECLOSURE) FILED BY
Date: Jun 06, 2023MEMO
Date: Jun 06, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT OF STATUS OF ACCOUNT
Date: Jun 06, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: May 08, 2023ANSWER OF
Date: Feb 23, 2023PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED
Date: Jan 31, 2023COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: Dec 02, 2022PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED
Date: Dec 02, 2022INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: Dec 02, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED FOR COSTS | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COST BILL RENDERED TO | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT (FORECLOSURE) FILED BY | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMO | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT OF STATUS OF ACCOUNT | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED & FILED SERVED-- NAME DATE-----FEES | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PERSONAL SERVICE ISSUED | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILER NUMBER P | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SPECIAL PROJECT FUND | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S FORECLOSURE FUND | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-TECHNOLOGY FUND | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-COURT MEDIATION PROGRAM | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK COMPUTERIZATION FEE (CIVIL) | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT COMPUTER RESEARCH (CIVIL) | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL AID (TOSCV) FILED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL NEWS | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED |