Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
M Station LLC VS Daysia Sturdivant
On June 17, 2024 a civil magistrate summary ejectment case was filed by M Station Llc, against Sturdivant, Daysia, in the jurisdiction of Mecklenburg County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 17, 2024
Last Refreshed
July 06, 2024
Filing Location
Mecklenburg County, NC
Filing Court House
Mecklenburg District Court
Category
Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Return of Service - Served
Date: Jun 21, 2024Civil Summons
Date: Jun 17, 2024Servicemember Civil Relief Act
Date: Jun 17, 2024Complaint
Date: Jun 17, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service - Served | |
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Summons | |
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Servicemember Civil Relief Act | |
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint |