Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Emergency Protective Order of Waller
On April 11, 2024 a petitions - other case was filed by Carlsbad Police Department, against Waller, William James, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 26, 2024
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Carlsbad Police Department. Refers to: Waller, William | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail filed by Carlsbad Police Department. | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed by Carlsbad Police Department. | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/25/2024 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 . | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-61. | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Gun Violence Emergency Protective Order filed by Carlsbad Police Department. Refers to: Waller, William | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carlsbad Police Department. Refers to: Waller, William |