Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank [USA] NA vs Seipert
On September 30, 2021 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Capital One Bank, represented by Aposhian, George, against Seipert, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023. |
|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022. |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank [USA] NA. Refers to: SEIPERT, MICHAEL |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non Military Declaration - Other filed by Capital One Bank [USA] NA. Refers to: SEIPERT, MICHAEL |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank [USA] NA. Refers to: SEIPERT, MICHAEL |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-61. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank [USA] NA. Refers to: SEIPERT, MICHAEL |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|