Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Petition of Ruiz
On September 20, 2021 a petitions - other case was filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Anthony J. Campagna presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Roberto Jesus Ruiz was GRANTED. | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 12/16/2021 08:30:00 AM. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Publication filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Publication filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Amended) filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Name Change continued pursuant to Court's motion to 12/16/2021 at 08:30AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Anthony J. Campagna |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 11/03/2021 08:30:00 AM. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-61. | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus received but not filed on 09/20/2021. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 . | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ruiz, Roberto Jesus. |
|