Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cavalry SPV I LLC vs Caballero
On October 04, 2019 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Cavalry Spv I Llc, represented by Siduguen, Christine S, against Caballero, Marcos, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 0 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Cavalry SPV I LLC and against Caballero, Marcos for $ 2275.02, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 245.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2520.02. | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ****DEFAULT DOCUMENTS RECEIVED****See Carlos | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk (CC1788.60/CCP 1033/Dismissal of Does) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | The default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC was entered as to Caballero, Marcos on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used. | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-26. | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Caballero, Marcos |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Summons [A document for ROA# 3] |
|