Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Pittman vs PHH Mortgage Corporation
On April 30, 2019 an other real property case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2019
Last Refreshed
May 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Pittma, Michael C, on 04/30/2019, has expired. | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/03/2020 10:00:00 AM. |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of entry of judgment of dismissal) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for PHH Mortgage Corporation and against Pittma, Michael C for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00. | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dismissal filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Refers to: Pittma, Michael |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/01/2019 01:30:00 PM. |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published. | |
October 31, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | The motion of Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation for judgment on the pleadings is granted without leave to amend. Judicial notice is taken as requested. The complaint fails to allege that Plaintiff wa...
Judge: Earl H. Maas III |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas. | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/03/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in N-28 before Earl H. Maas at North County. |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply (11/01) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (11/1 SUBMISSION WITHOUT APPEARANCE) filed by Pittma, Michael C. |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (11/1/19) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 11/01/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas. | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Pittma, Michael C. | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/27/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas. | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pittma, Michael C. Refers to: PHH Mortgage Corporation; Western Progressive LLC |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Pittma, Michael C. Refers to: PHH Mortgage Corporation; Western Progressive LLC |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Pittma, Michael C. Refers to: PHH Mortgage Corporation; Western Progressive LLC |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.
Judge: Maas Earl |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Pittma, Michael C. |
|