Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Norman vs Parmenter
On April 04, 2019 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 20 days
Time To Trial
5 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Norman, Robert Eugene . | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Parmenter, Brenda Teresa . | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Parmenter, Paul Allen Payumo . | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Status of Mediation process changed to Settled at hearing. | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by DOMINSKI, DEBRA A. |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediator Selection Form filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Status of Mediation process changed to Pending. | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury demanded by all parties. | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil. | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2019 01:30:00 PM. |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties. | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil. | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Parmenter, Brenda Teresa; Parmenter, Paul Allen Payumo. |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Parmenter, Brenda Teresa; Parmenter, Paul Allen Payumo. |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Parmenter, Brenda Teresa; Parmenter, Paul Allen Payumo. |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil. | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. Refers to: Parmenter, Brenda; Parmenter, Paul |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. Refers to: Parmenter, Brenda; Parmenter, Paul |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Norman, Robert Eugene. Refers to: Parmenter, Brenda; Parmenter, Paul |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.
Judge: Wohlfeil Joel |