Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank USA NA vs Wallace
On April 04, 2019 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Capital One Bank Usa Na, represented by Danielyan, Elmira, against Wallace, Riley C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Capital One Bank USA NA. | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Wallace, Riley C . | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Wallace, Riley |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Wallace, Riley |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Wallace, Riley |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Wallace, Riley |
|