Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NM-Skye LLC vs. Stoddard
On December 13, 2018 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Nm-Skye Llc, represented by Schneider, Adam, against Stoddard, Amy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution submitted by NM-Skye LLC received but not filed on 01/18/2022. |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment submitted by NM-Skye LLC received but not filed on 12/14/2021. | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | *Writ of Execution received* | |
March 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Stoddard, Amy, on 12/21/2018, has expired. | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for NM-Skye LLC and against Stoddard, Amy for a grand total of $ 6146.17 . | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered, Plaintiff directed to prepare the judgment. | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 01/11/2019 08:30:00 AM. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by NM-Skye LLC. Refers to: Stoddard, Amy |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered. | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment rendered for NM-Skye LLC and against Amy Stoddard for a grand total of 6146.17 . | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 01/11/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 . |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by NM-Skye LLC. |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Stoddard, Amy. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (Order Signed 12/20/2018) filed by NM-Skye LLC. Refers to: Stoddard, Amy |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Stoddard, Amy. | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Stoddard, Amy. |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by NM-Skye LLC. Refers to: Stoddard, Amy |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NM-Skye LLC. Refers to: Stoddard, Amy |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-60. | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by NM-Skye LLC. Refers to: Stoddard, Amy |
|