Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs Porturas
On September 28, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Brinkerhoff, Kristen L, against Porturas, Belinda R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 28, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC and against Porturas, Belinda R for $ 8303.66, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 285.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 8588.66. | |
September 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Porturas, Belinda R on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC . | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of Does) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Porturas, Belinda |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |