Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovey Associates, LLC vs Musick
On September 18, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Collins, Emily, against Musick, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Earl H. Maas III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 18, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 19, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO COUNTY) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC and against Musick, Joseph for $ 1311.30, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 240.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1551.80. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Default (1033) Declaration - Other filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | The default filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC was entered as to Musick, Joseph on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used. | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of default judgment by court CCP 585(d) Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Maas,Earl to N-26 effective 02/16/2019. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Musick, Joseph |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.
Judge: Maas Earl |