Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Silhouette Optical LTD vs Be Seen Optics LLC
On September 27, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Dumangas-Klehr, David James . | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Silhouette Optical LTD. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Be Seen Optics LLC. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. |
|
January 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020. |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. Refers to: Be Seen Optics LLC |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. Refers to: Be Seen Optics LLC; Dumangas-Klehr, David |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. Refers to: Be Seen Optics LLC; Dumangas-Klehr, David |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Silhouette Optical LTD. Refers to: Be Seen Optics LLC; Dumangas-Klehr, David |
|