Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs Luna
On September 25, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Brinkerhoff, Kristen L, against Luna, Alberto Barrios, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 25, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 15, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 03:00:00 PM at Central in 1402 . |
|
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023. |
|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022. |
|
January 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Luna, Alberto |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Luna, Alberto |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Luna, Alberto |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 903.
Judge: David M. Rubin |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Luna, Alberto |
|