Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 vs Seale
On September 25, 2018 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Richard Schag Trustee Of The Schag Family Trust Dated October 1 1993, represented by Mckinley, James R, against Seale, Christian, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 25, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Accrued Interest $965.03) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution submitted by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 received but not filed on 05/31/2022. |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 and against Seale, Christian for a grand total of $ 5110.76 . | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court ($ 5110.76 MONEY JUDGMENT) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (FILED with MOC and App. for court judgment) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 rejected on 03/27/2019. |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (with supporting documents) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 rejected on 10/30/2018. |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only [Another document for ROA# 15] |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 and against Seale, Christian for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants E-filing transaction partially accepted. |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Seale, Christian on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 . | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993 received but not filed on 10/22/2018. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-60. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Richard Schag Trustee of the Schag Family Trust dated October 1 1993. Refers to: Seale, Christian |
|