Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Petition of Flores
On September 25, 2018 a petitions - other case was filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 25, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 month and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia. |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 11/15/2018 10:30:00 AM. |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by petitioner was granted. | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Publication filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia. |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet [A document for ROA# 2] |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia. |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia. |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name [A document for ROA# 3] |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Guerrero Flores, Maria Antonia. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in 903 . | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|