Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CEMROCK LANDSCAPES vs PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES
On September 21, 2018 a breach of contract/warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 21, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Recorded Withdrawal of Pendency of Action filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated. | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to PLAY U.S. ACQUISITIONCO INC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LEGOLAND CARLSBAD INC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS, INC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS, INC |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PLAY U.S. ACQUISITIONCO INC |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: LEGOLAND CARLSBAD INC |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (1/4/19) submitted by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC received but not filed on 10/09/2018. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (1/4/19) filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Michael K. Murray in Support of Declaration - Other (1/4/19) filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (1/4/19) filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern. | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (1/4/19) filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated. | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Pendency of Action filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern. | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern. | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.
Judge: Stern Jacqueline |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC; PLAY U.S. ACQUISITIONCO INC; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC; LEGOLAND CARLSBAD INC; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS, INC |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC; PLAY U.S. ACQUISITIONCO INC; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC; LEGOLAND CARLSBAD INC; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS, INC |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CEMROCK LANDSCAPES, INC. Refers to: PCL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC; PLAY U.S. ACQUISITIONCO INC; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC; LEGOLAND CARLSBAD INC; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS, INC |
|