Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cach LLC vs Porras
On September 20, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Cach Llc, represented by Mandarich, Chris D; Rudiman, Stasia A, against Porras, Roberto D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David M. Rubin;Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal SD generated. |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 10/09/2023 09:30:00 AM. |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in 1604 . |
|
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023. |
|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022. |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court (Submitted 8/31/20) submitted by Cach LLC rejected on 09/04/2020. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD The default filed by Cach LLC was denied. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default [Another document for ROA# 16] |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cach LLC. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (with Dismissal of Does and Supporting Documents) filed by Cach LLC. |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail filed by Cach LLC. |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (First) filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Cach LLC. |
|
January 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD [Another document for ROA# 9] |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court (submitted 1/9/19) submitted by Cach LLC rejected on 05/06/2019. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default The default filed by Cach LLC was denied. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (with dismissal of does and other supporting declarations) filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cach LLC. Refers to: Porras, Roberto |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 903.
Judge: David M. Rubin |