Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KBR INC vs Gonzalez
On September 19, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Kbr Inc, represented by Oliveira, Duane S, against Gonzalez, Luis, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 19, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Gonzalez, Luis . | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to KBR INC. | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by KBR INC. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by KBR INC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Luis |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Original Summons submitted by KBR INC rejected on 09/20/2018. |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by KBR INC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Luis |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by KBR INC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Luis |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |