Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Synchrony Bank vs Phillips
On September 13, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Synchrony Bank, represented by Kahn, Michael D, against Phillips, Michelle Caron, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Synchrony Bank and against Phillips, Michelle Caron for $ 1404.58, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 292.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1697.08. | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Phillips, Michelle Caron on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Synchrony Bank . | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (with dismissal of does and supporting declarations) filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Phillips, Michelle |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |