Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank NA vs Gegan
On September 06, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Wells Fargo Bank Na, represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Gegan, Denyce M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Gegan, Denyce |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Gegan, Denyce M . | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank NA. | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Gegan, Denyce |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Gegan, Denyce |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Gegan, Denyce |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Summons [A document for ROA# 3] |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Gegan, Denyce |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.
Judge: Casserly Timothy |