Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank NA vs Woodard
On September 06, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-26 was vacated. | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank NA. | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Woodward, Kerry . | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-26 . | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/02/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in N-26 before at North County. |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Participant) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to N-26 effective 02/16/2019. |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference reassigned to for 07/12/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in N-26 at North County. | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/12/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Woodward, Kerry. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.
Judge: Casserly Timothy |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Woodward, Kerry |
|