Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MCGEE VS HELMY
On September 12, 2018 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Mcgee, Marisa, against Helmy, Adam Samih, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for McGee, Marisa and against HELMY, ADAM SAMIH for a grand total of $ 0.00 . | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only submitted by McGee, Marisa rejected on 09/25/2018. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to HELMY, ADAM SAMIH on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by McGee, Marisa . | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-60. | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by McGee, Marisa. Refers to: HELMY, ADAM |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. |