Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cavalry SPV I LLC vs. Santos
On September 10, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Cavalry Spv I Llc, represented by Siduguen, Christine S, against Santos, Elisa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees dismissed with prejudice as to SANTOS, ELISA . | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees dismissed with prejudice as to Cavalry SPV I LLC. | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: SANTOS, ELISA |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: SANTOS, ELISA |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: SANTOS, ELISA |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: SANTOS, ELISA |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |