Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sharruss Portfolio Management vs Nguyen
On September 07, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Sharruss Portfolio Management, represented by Hasic, Halil, against Nguyen, Bill, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 07, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 04, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David M. Rubin;Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 11/03/2023 10:45:00 AM. |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in 1604 . |
|
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023. |
|
July 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022. |
|
January 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020. |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (first) filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. Refers to: Nguyen, Bill |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (amended) filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. Refers to: Nguyen, Bill |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 903.
Judge: David M. Rubin |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. Refers to: Nguyen, Bill |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SHARRUSS PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT. Refers to: Nguyen, Bill |
|