Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Smith vs. Kellett
On September 10, 2018 a harassment case was filed by Smith, Dale E, against Kellett, Virginia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Smith, Dale E, on 09/10/2018, has expired. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed with prejudice. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/28/2018 08:30:00 AM. | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Smith, Dale E. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-24. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DENIED) filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 09/28/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-24 . | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Smith, Dale E. Refers to: Kellett, Virginia |