Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank vs Vieville
On September 04, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Patterson, Erin E, against Vieville, Colette J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 10 months and 15 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Vieville, Colette J . | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank. |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Discover Bank. | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Discover Bank. |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to N-26 effective 02/16/2019. |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vieville, Colette |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vieville, Colette |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Vieville, Colette |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.
Judge: Casserly Timothy |