Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank USA NA VS Elias
On September 06, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Capital One Bank Usa Na, represented by Sherrill, Donald, against Elias, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution issued. | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution submitted by Capital One Bank USA NA received but not filed on 06/20/2023. |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | *Abstract of Judgment received* | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Capital One Bank USA NA and against Elias, Raymond for $ 2914.12, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 284.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3198.62. | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Summary Statement of Case filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Default (1033) Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Elias, Raymond on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA . | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Elias, Raymond |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 903.
Judge: David M. Rubin |