Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JHPDE Finance 1 LLC vs Whinery
On September 04, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Jhpde Finance 1 Llc, represented by Zide, Flint C, against Whinery, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Whinery, Jeremy . | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service (Jeremy Whinery) filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JHPDE Finance 1 LLC. Refers to: Whinery, Jeremy |
|