Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Express National Bank vs Nathaniel Mansoor
On September 04, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by American Express National Bank; Fka : American Express Centurion Bank, represented by Michael, Lina M, against Mansoor, Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Mansoor, Nathaniel . | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to American Express National Bank. | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express National Bank. |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank. |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Mansoor, Nathaniel |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Mansoor, Nathaniel |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Mansoor, Nathaniel |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |