Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank VS Shayna Lynn
On January 17, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Babaians, Bianca, against Lynn, Shayna, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Discover Bank and against Lynn, Shayna for $ 16081.65, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 447.95, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 16529.60. | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (with Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | The default filed by Discover Bank was entered as to Lynn, Shayna on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used. | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Lynn, Shayna |
|