Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust vs Nicole Reza
On January 17, 2018 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee Of The Prickett Family Trust, represented by Owens, David A, against Reza, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust and against Reza, Nicole for a grand total of 4628.65 . | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Judgment (FILED WITH DEC 585 and DISMISSAL OF UKNOWN OCCUPANTS) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including All Unknowns) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment entered for Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust and against Reza, Nicole for a grand total of 0.00 . | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession issued. | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by Posting(UD) Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust received but not filed on 03/09/2018. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
as to Nicole Reza Proof of service by Posting(UD) (as to Nicole Reza) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Reza, Nicole on Amended Complaint filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust . | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Entered) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (Order Signed 02/20/2018) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Demanding Less than 10,000 Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-60. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gregg L Prickett Trustee of the Prickett Family Trust. Refers to: Reza, Nicole |
|