Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank vs Sammons
On January 17, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Babaians, Bianca, against Sammons, Barry E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank. |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Discover Bank. | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Sammons, Barry E . | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Discover Bank. |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Sammons, Barry |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Sammons, Barry |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Sammons, Barry |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. |