Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Rush vs City of San Diego Parking Administration
On January 17, 2018 a judicial review - other case was filed against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Status
Active
Parties
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Administrative Parking Hearing heard 03/12/2018 02:45:00 PM. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated. |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits filed by City of San Diego Parking Administration. Refers to: Rush, Bruce | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Administrative Parking Hearing was scheduled for 03/12/2018 at 02:45:00 PM in KM-A at Central |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by Rush, Bruce. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Rush, Bruce. Refers to: City of San Diego Parking Administration | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department KM-A. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Rush, Bruce. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal (Parking) filed by Rush, Bruce. Refers to: City of San Diego Parking Administration |