Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TD Bank USA NA vs Douglas
On January 12, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Td Bank Usa Na, represented by Boone, Stephanie J, against Douglas, Karen, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 4 months and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by TD Bank USA NA rejected on 06/12/2020. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for TD Bank USA NA and against Douglas, Karen for $ 988.42, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 292.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1280.92. | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Douglas, Karen on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA . | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (with supporting documents) filed by TD Bank USA NA. |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (as to Karen Douglas) filed by TD Bank USA NA. |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (as to Karen Douglas) filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 903. | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Douglas, Karen |
|