Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CMRE Financial Services Inc vs. Anthony Smith
On January 12, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Cmre Financial Services Inc, represented by Love, Franklin J, against Smith, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees dismissed with prejudice as to Smith, Anthony . | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees dismissed with prejudice as to CMRE Financial Services Inc. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Smith, Anthony |
|
January 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-26 to N-03 effective 01/09/2021. |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated. |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to N-26 effective 02/16/2019. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Smith, Anthony |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.
Judge: Stern Jacqueline |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Smith, Anthony |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Smith, Anthony |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Smith, Anthony |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. |