Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
National Funding Inc vs Pacific Structures Construction Inc
On January 04, 2018 a breach of contract/warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2022
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/30/3019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated. | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing (Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Pacific Structures Construction, Inc. d/b/a Pacific Structures Construction) filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for National Funding Inc and against Pacific Structures Construction Inc for $ 369437.55, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 5760.00, interest: $ 39775.53, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 414973.08. | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Meier, Michael |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Meier, Michael . | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc; Meier, Michael |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/30/3019 at 01:30PM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon. | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2019 10:30:00 AM. |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/11/2019 09:00:00 AM. |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published. | |
January 10, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING Plaintiff National Funding, Inc.s unopposed motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, summary adjudication, is granted. Plaintiff has established Pacific Structures Constru...
Judge: Eddie C Sturgeon |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Index of Exhibits re Motion for Summary Judgment Exhibit List filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of S. Otero re Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration - Other (of Sandra Otero) filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order submitted by National Funding Inc received but not filed on 10/23/2018. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Y.Chun re MSJ Declaration - Other (of Yujin Chun) filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
POS re NF's MSJ Proof of Service filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
P_Pacific - 18-09-24 Notice of Continued CMC - Notice of Hearing filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/11/2019 at 09:00AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon. | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/21/2018 10:30:00 AM. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 01/11/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon. | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Participant) filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Meier, Michael |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
P_Pacific - 18-06-19 Notice of Continued CMC - Notice of Hearing filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/21/2018 at 10:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon. | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/15/2018 10:30:00 AM. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint Answer filed by Meier, Michael; Pacific Structures Construction Inc. |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
P_Pacific - 18-01-23 POS of Summons of M. Meier - Proof of Service filed by National Funding Inc. |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc; Meier, Michael |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.
Judge: Sturgeon Eddie |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc; Meier, Michael |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon. | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: Pacific Structures Construction Inc; Meier, Michael |
|