Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Zhang vs. Scullin
On April 29, 2013 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Ronald S. Prager presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Scullin, Carolyn . | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson . | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Henderson, Demra . | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Notice of Change in Handling Attorney submitted by Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra rejected on 03/10/2015. |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Demra Henderson) filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Henderson, Demra |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Carolyn Scullin) filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Scullin, Carolyn |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Henderson, Demra |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Henderson, Demra |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee Deposit Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial filed by Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra. |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Prager, Ronald.
Judge: Prager Ronald |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zhang, Xiaodong Nelson. Refers to: Scullin, Carolyn; Henderson, Demra |
|