Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SERRA vs. County Of San Diego
On April 29, 2013 a pi/pd/wd - auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal SD generated. |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by SERRA, NATHAN. |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SERRA, NATHAN. Refers to: County Of San Diego; San Diego County Sheriff's Department; CANNON, JOHN |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.
Judge: Casserly Timothy |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by SERRA, NATHAN. Refers to: County Of San Diego; San Diego County Sheriff's Department; CANNON, JOHN |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by SERRA, NATHAN. Refers to: County Of San Diego; San Diego County Sheriff's Department; CANNON, JOHN |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|