Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Credit Acceptance Corporation vs. Price
On April 26, 2013 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation, represented by Clark, Rory W, against Price, Tammy ; Aka : Price, Tammy A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal (AND POS - BY MAIL-SENT ON 8/13/2013) filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Price, Tammy . | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Credit Acceptance Corporation. | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-26. | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: Price, Tammy |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons issued. |